LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS 200 W. Washington St., Suite 301 Indianapolis, IN 46204 (317) 233-0696 iga.in.gov FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT LS 6035 NOTE PREPARED: Mar 1, 2024 BILL NUMBER: SB 34 BILL AMENDED: Feb 1, 2024 SUBJECT: Occupational Licensing. FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Rogers BILL STATUS: Enrolled FIRST SPONSOR: Rep. Miller D FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL IMPACT: State DEDICATED FEDERAL Summary of Legislation: Occupational License Study– The bill requires the Professional Licensing Agency (PLA) to study universal occupational licensing laws enacted in other states. The bill requires the PLA to submit a report with findings and recommendations to the General Assembly not later than October 31, 2025. Comprehensive Occupational Review– The bill extends certain dates and expands certain duties regarding the comprehensive review of occupational licensing by public agencies. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the Interim Study Committee on Employment and Labor.) Effective Date: Upon passage. Explanation of State Expenditures: Occupational License Study– The bill would allow the PLA to delegate the study by entering into a contract of up to $50,000. Any further expenditures would have to be funded within PLA’s budget. Comprehensive Occupational Review– This provision would not substantially increase the workload of the study already assigned under HEA 1343-2023. The State Budget Agency has estimated the original study that is established under HEA 1343-2023 would require an estimated $7.5 M to complete. It is anticipated that the provisions of this bill would not substantially increase the cost of the study. Explanation of State Revenues: SB 34 1 Explanation of Local Expenditures: Explanation of Local Revenues: State Agencies Affected: Professional Licensing Agency; all state agencies that regulate or license individuals. Local Agencies Affected: Information Sources: Doug Boyle, Director of Legislative Affairs and Communications, Professional Licensing Agency; Matt Wolf, Division Director, State Budget Agency; List of Appropriations Made by Regular Session of the 2023 General Assembly Biennium July 1, 2023 to June 30, 2025. Fiscal Analyst: Chris Baker, 317-232-9851. SB 34 2