Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0034 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/27/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6035	NOTE PREPARED: Feb 27, 2024
BILL NUMBER: SB 34	BILL AMENDED: Feb 1, 2024
SUBJECT: Occupational Licensing.
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Rogers	BILL STATUS: As Passed House
FIRST SPONSOR: Rep. Miller D
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: Occupational License Study– The bill requires the Professional Licensing Agency
(PLA) to study universal occupational licensing laws enacted in other states. The bill requires the PLA to
submit a report with findings and recommendations to the General Assembly not later than October 31, 2025.
Comprehensive Occupational Review– The bill extends certain dates and expands certain duties regarding
the comprehensive review of occupational licensing by public agencies.
(The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the Interim Study Committee on Employment and
Labor.)
Effective Date:  Upon passage.
Explanation of State Expenditures: Occupational License Study– The bill would allow the PLA to delegate
the study by entering into a contract of up to $50,000. Any further expenditures would have to be funded
within PLA’s budget.
Comprehensive Occupational Review– This provision would not substantially increase the workload of the
study already assigned under HEA 1343-2023. The State Budget Agency has estimated the original study
that is established under HEA 1343-2023 would require an estimated $7.5 M to complete. It is anticipated
that the provisions of this bill would not substantially increase the cost of the study.
Explanation of State Revenues: 
SB 34	1 Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: Professional Licensing Agency; all state agencies that regulate or license
individuals.
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: Doug Boyle, Director of Legislative Affairs and Communications, Professional
Licensing Agency; Matt Wolf, Division Director, State Budget Agency; List of Appropriations Made by
Regular Session of the 2023 General Assembly Biennium July 1, 2023 to June 30, 2025. 
Fiscal Analyst: Chris Baker,  317-232-9851.
SB 34	2