Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0034 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 01/25/2024

                    *SB0034.1*
January 26, 2024
SENATE BILL No. 34
_____
DIGEST OF SB 34 (Updated January 24, 2024 11:33 am - DI 153)
Citations Affected:  IC 25-1.
Synopsis:  Occupational licensing. Requires the professional licensing
agency (agency) to study universal occupational licensing laws enacted
in other states. Requires the agency to submit a report with findings and
recommendations to the general assembly not later than October 31,
2025. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the interim
study committee on employment and labor.)
Effective:  Upon passage.
Rogers, Crane, Hunley, Ford J.D.
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology.
January 16, 2024, reassigned to Committee on Pensions and Labor pursuant to Rule 68(b).
January 25, 2024, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass.
SB 34—LS 6035/DI 141  January 26, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 34
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
professions and occupations.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 25-1-6-11 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 UPON PASSAGE]: Sec. 11. (a) The licensing agency shall study
4 other states that have adopted universal occupational licensing, at
5 least in part, and evaluate the effectiveness and ease of
6 administration of those laws.
7 (b) Not later than October 31, 2025, the licensing agency shall:
8 (1) prepare a report with findings and recommendations
9 based on the licensing agency's study and evaluation under
10 subsection (a); and
11 (2) submit the report to the general assembly in an electronic
12 format under IC 5-14-6.
13 (c) The licensing agency may delegate its duties under
14 subsection (a) to another person so long as the contract price does
15 not exceed fifty thousand dollars ($50,000).
16 (d) This section expires July 1, 2026.
17 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
SB 34—LS 6035/DI 141 2
REPORT OF THE PRESIDENT
PRO TEMPORE
Madam President: Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b), I hereby report
that Senate Bill 34, currently assigned to the Committee on Commerce
and Technology, be reassigned to the Committee on Pensions and
Labor.
BRAY
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Pensions and Labor,
to which was referred Senate Bill No. 34, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows:
Page 1, line 3, delete "shall:" and insert "shall study other states
that have adopted universal occupational licensing, at least in part,
and evaluate the effectiveness and ease of administration of those
laws.".
Page 1, delete lines 4 through 13.
Page 1, line 14, delete "2024," and insert "2025,".
Page 2, between lines 2 and 3, begin a new paragraph and insert:
"(c) The licensing agency may delegate its duties under
subsection (a) to another person so long as the contract price does
not exceed fifty thousand dollars ($50,000).".
Page 2, line 3, delete "(c)" and insert "(d)".
Page 2, line 3, delete "2025." and insert "2026.".
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to SB 34 as introduced.)
ROGERS, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0.
SB 34—LS 6035/DI 141