Senate | 03/11/2024 | Public Law 9 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 93, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Representatives Pierce K, Boy, DeLaney added as cosponsors | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Engleman | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 13: yeas 46, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Senators Freeman and Taylor G |