Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0035 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Fiscal Note February 20, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Fiscal Note January 22, 2024
Fiscal Note January 16, 2024
Fiscal Note January 11, 2024
Bill December 21, 2023
Fiscal Note December 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 11, 2024