Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Representative Bartels added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Buck added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Cosponsor: Representative Miller D
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative King
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Walker G added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Messmer added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Freeman added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Doriot
|
|
|