| 1 | + | *ES0036.1* |
---|
| 2 | + | February 15, 2024 |
---|
| 3 | + | ENGROSSED |
---|
| 4 | + | SENATE BILL No. 36 |
---|
| 5 | + | _____ |
---|
| 6 | + | DIGEST OF SB 36 (Updated February 14, 2024 11:16 am - DI 140) |
---|
| 7 | + | Citations Affected: IC 25-21.5. |
---|
| 8 | + | Synopsis: Interference with boundary marker. Creates a civil penalty |
---|
| 9 | + | for a person who knowingly or intentionally disturbs or removes a |
---|
| 10 | + | boundary marker, and permits a court to order a person who disturbs or |
---|
| 11 | + | removes a boundary marker to pay for the cost of reestablishing the |
---|
| 12 | + | boundary marker. |
---|
| 13 | + | Effective: July 1, 2024. |
---|
| 14 | + | Doriot, Freeman, Messmer, |
---|
| 15 | + | Walker G, Buck |
---|
| 16 | + | (HOUSE SPONSORS — KING, MILLER D, BARTELS) |
---|
| 17 | + | January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal |
---|
| 18 | + | Law. |
---|
| 19 | + | January 16, 2024, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass. |
---|
| 20 | + | January 18, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. |
---|
| 21 | + | January 23, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 48, nays 0. |
---|
| 22 | + | HOUSE ACTION |
---|
| 23 | + | February 6, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code. |
---|
| 24 | + | February 15, 2024, reported — Do Pass. |
---|
| 25 | + | ES 36—LS 6180/DI 150 February 15, 2024 |
---|
15 | | - | SECTION 1. IC 25-21.5-1-3.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA |
---|
16 | | - | CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
17 | | - | [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 3.2. "Boundary marker" means |
---|
18 | | - | a symbol, sign, or object placed by a: |
---|
19 | | - | (1) professional surveyor; or |
---|
20 | | - | (2) person acting under the direct supervision of a |
---|
21 | | - | professional surveyor; |
---|
22 | | - | for the purpose of demarking any point, course, or line in the |
---|
23 | | - | boundary of a tract of land. |
---|
24 | | - | SECTION 2. IC 25-21.5-1-6.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA |
---|
25 | | - | CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
26 | | - | [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 6.7. "Person" means the |
---|
27 | | - | following: |
---|
28 | | - | (1) An entity. |
---|
29 | | - | (2) A corporation. |
---|
30 | | - | (3) An individual. |
---|
31 | | - | (4) A limited liability company. |
---|
32 | | - | (5) A partnership. |
---|
33 | | - | SECTION 3. IC 25-21.5-13-1.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA |
---|
34 | | - | CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
35 | | - | [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.5. (a) A person, not having an |
---|
36 | | - | SEA 36 2 |
---|
37 | | - | ownership interest in land, who knowingly or intentionally disturbs |
---|
38 | | - | or removes a boundary marker on the tract of land commits a |
---|
39 | | - | Class C infraction. |
---|
40 | | - | (b) In addition to the judgment awarded under IC 34-28-5-4, the |
---|
41 | | - | court may order a person who violates subsection (a) to pay to the |
---|
42 | | - | landowner the cost of reestablishing the boundary marker. |
---|
43 | | - | SEA 36 President of the Senate |
---|
44 | | - | President Pro Tempore |
---|
45 | | - | Speaker of the House of Representatives |
---|
46 | | - | Governor of the State of Indiana |
---|
47 | | - | Date: Time: |
---|
48 | | - | SEA 36 |
---|
| 41 | + | 1 SECTION 1. IC 25-21.5-1-3.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA |
---|
| 42 | + | 2 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
| 43 | + | 3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 3.2. "Boundary marker" means |
---|
| 44 | + | 4 a symbol, sign, or object placed by a: |
---|
| 45 | + | 5 (1) professional surveyor; or |
---|
| 46 | + | 6 (2) person acting under the direct supervision of a |
---|
| 47 | + | 7 professional surveyor; |
---|
| 48 | + | 8 for the purpose of demarking any point, course, or line in the |
---|
| 49 | + | 9 boundary of a tract of land. |
---|
| 50 | + | 10 SECTION 2. IC 25-21.5-1-6.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA |
---|
| 51 | + | 11 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
| 52 | + | 12 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 6.7. "Person" means the |
---|
| 53 | + | 13 following: |
---|
| 54 | + | 14 (1) An entity. |
---|
| 55 | + | 15 (2) A corporation. |
---|
| 56 | + | 16 (3) An individual. |
---|
| 57 | + | 17 (4) A limited liability company. |
---|
| 58 | + | ES 36—LS 6180/DI 150 2 |
---|
| 59 | + | 1 (5) A partnership. |
---|
| 60 | + | 2 SECTION 3. IC 25-21.5-13-1.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA |
---|
| 61 | + | 3 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
| 62 | + | 4 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.5. (a) A person, not having an |
---|
| 63 | + | 5 ownership interest in land, who knowingly or intentionally disturbs |
---|
| 64 | + | 6 or removes a boundary marker on the tract of land commits a |
---|
| 65 | + | 7 Class C infraction. |
---|
| 66 | + | 8 (b) In addition to the judgment awarded under IC 34-28-5-4, the |
---|
| 67 | + | 9 court may order a person who violates subsection (a) to pay to the |
---|
| 68 | + | 10 landowner the cost of reestablishing the boundary marker. |
---|
| 69 | + | ES 36—LS 6180/DI 150 3 |
---|
| 70 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 71 | + | Madam President: The Senate Committee on Corrections and |
---|
| 72 | + | Criminal Law, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 36, has had the |
---|
| 73 | + | same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the |
---|
| 74 | + | Senate with the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as |
---|
| 75 | + | follows: |
---|
| 76 | + | Page 2, delete lines 8 through 9, begin a new paragraph and insert: |
---|
| 77 | + | "(b) In addition to the judgment awarded under IC 34-28-5-4, |
---|
| 78 | + | the court may order a person who violates subsection (a) to pay to |
---|
| 79 | + | the landowner the cost of reestablishing the boundary marker.". |
---|
| 80 | + | and when so amended that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 81 | + | (Reference is to SB 36 as introduced.) |
---|
| 82 | + | FREEMAN, Chairperson |
---|
| 83 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0. |
---|
| 84 | + | _____ |
---|
| 85 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 86 | + | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Courts and Criminal Code, to |
---|
| 87 | + | which was referred Senate Bill 36, has had the same under |
---|
| 88 | + | consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with |
---|
| 89 | + | the recommendation that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 90 | + | (Reference is to SB 36 as printed January 17, 2024.) |
---|
| 91 | + | MCNAMARA |
---|
| 92 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0 |
---|
| 93 | + | ES 36—LS 6180/DI 150 |
---|