Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 102
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senator Pol removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 267: yeas 37, nays 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 218: yeas 90, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Pol added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Cosponsor: Representative Olthoff
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Slager
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 33: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Dernulc) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senators Niemeyer and Dernulc
|
|
|