Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Representative Lindauer added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Yoder added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Zent and Judy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Abbott
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Crane added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Baldwin added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Niezgodski added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Niezgodski removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senators Alexander, Byrne, Qaddoura added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Glick
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Senator Tomes added as second author
|
|
|