House
|
02/27/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Representatives Behning and Speedy added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Buck added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Young M added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Young M removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative McGuire
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 35, nays 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senators Raatz, Zay, Busch, Byrne added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senators Maxwell, Dernulc, Bohacek, Niemeyer added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Goode G added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senators Doriot, Gaskill, Buchanan, Johnson T added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment #7 (Hunley) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment #3 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 30: yeas 9, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment #4 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 29: yeas 9, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment #6 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senators Young M, Glick, Leising added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senators Messmer, Donato, Koch, Tomes added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Doriot removed as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Freeman
|
|
|