Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0052 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 25, 2024
Fiscal Note January 22, 2024
Fiscal Note January 4, 2024
Fiscal Note December 21, 2023
Bill December 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill January 25, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 27, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024