Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0052 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/27/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6297	NOTE PREPARED: Feb 27, 2024
BILL NUMBER: SB 52	BILL AMENDED: Feb 27, 2024
SUBJECT: Prohibition on Use of Dedicated Lanes. 
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Freeman	BILL STATUS: CR Adopted - 2
nd
 House
FIRST SPONSOR: Rep. McGuire
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State & Local
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: (Amended) Traffic Signs: The bill prohibits, until July 1, 2025, a consolidated
city from installing any additional sign prohibiting a turn at a steady red signal. It specifies that the temporary
prohibition does not affect such a sign installed before March 31, 2024. 
Dedicated Lanes: The bill prohibits, until July 1, 2025, a consolidated city from adopting or enforcing an
ordinance, resolution, rule, policy, or other requirement concerning a public transportation project, including
the blue line, that seeks to: (1) convert; (2) restrict; or (3) otherwise establish; a vehicular traffic lane for use
as a dedicated lane. The bill specifies exclusions from the scope of the bill's temporary prohibition. 
The bill also requires the driver of a passenger bus operating in a consolidated city that travels on a dedicated
lane in the opposite direction of the flow of traffic to sound a horn or bell when approaching an intersection
to alert pedestrians.
Effective Date: (Amended) Upon passage; July 1, 2024.
Explanation of State Expenditures: (Revised) Study Topics: The bill urges the Legislative Council to
assign two topics to the Interim Study Committee on Roads and Transportation. If the committee were to
hold additional meetings to address the topics, there would be additional expenditures for legislator per diem
and travel reimbursement for the committee members. Any additional expenditures must be within the
committee’s budget, which is established by the Legislative Council.   
Explanation of State Revenues: 
SB 52	1 Explanation of Local Expenditures: (Revised) Dedicated Lanes: The bill prohibits Marion County from
incorporating dedicated lanes into a public transportation project until July 1, 2025. The prohibition does not
apply to projects in which construction is completed by March 31, 2024, or the Indianapolis Public
Transportation Corporation (IndyGo) Purple Line.
The bill specifies the prohibition includes the Indygo Blue Line. The Blue Line is a bus rapid transit route
that will run between Cumberland and the Indianapolis International Airport along Washington Street and
I-70. The design is expected to be complete in early 2024 with construction beginning in early 2025. The
project is estimated to cost between $370 M and $390 M. 
Traffic Signs: The provision affecting traffic signs in Marion County should have no fiscal impact.
Explanation of Local Revenues:  If an approved application for a transportation project must be resubmitted
to the U.S. Department of Transportation, there is the potential that the amount of funding already committed
to a project will be revised.
State Agencies Affected: General Assembly. 
Local Agencies Affected: Marion County. 
Information Sources: https://www.indygo.net/blue-line/
Fiscal Analyst: Heath Holloway,  317-232-9867.
SB 52	2