Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 231: yeas 40, nays 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 159: yeas 88, nays 6
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Representative Lehman added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Manning and Miller K
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative GiaQuinta
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 42, nays 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Alting added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Senator Messmer added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Holdman
|
|
|