Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0058 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 1, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Fiscal Note February 13, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 25, 2024
Fiscal Note January 23, 2024
Fiscal Note January 19, 2024
Bill December 21, 2023
Fiscal Note December 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2024
Bill January 23, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024