House | 02/13/2024 | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Cosponsors: Representatives Teshka, Moed, Garcia Wilburn | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 47, nays 1 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senators Busch, Yoder, Pol added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Senator Johnson T added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |