Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 13, 2024
Fiscal Note February 6, 2024
Fiscal Note February 5, 2024
Fiscal Note February 1, 2024
Fiscal Note January 19, 2024
Fiscal Note January 8, 2024
Bill January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024