Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 106
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 308: yeas 40, nays 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 324: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senator Rogers added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senator Taylor G removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senator Rogers removed as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Rogers and Niezgodski
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Taylor G
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House advisors appointed: VanNatter, Behning, Lyness and Moseley
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Bartlett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 250: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Carbaugh) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Cosponsor: Representative Behning
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senators Brown L and Rogers
|
|
|