Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 8, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Fiscal Note February 28, 2024
Fiscal Note February 22, 2024
Fiscal Note January 30, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 19, 2024
Fiscal Note January 8, 2024
Bill January 8, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024