Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0157 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/08/2024

                     
Introduced Version
SENATE BILL No. 157
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 6-1.1-50.2.
Synopsis:  Landlocked property. Defines "landlocked property" as real
property that has been shut off from all public highways as a result of
the vacation of one or more public highways. Provides that if an action
of the state, or an agency or political subdivision of the state, causes
real property to become landlocked property, either: (1) the state must
purchase the landlocked property from the owner of the landlocked
property at an amount equal to the assessed value of the landlocked
property in a time and manner prescribed by the department of local
government finance; or (2) the county assessor of the county in which
the landlocked property is located must assess the value of the
landlocked property at zero for as long as the property qualifies as
landlocked property.
Effective:  January 1, 2024 (retroactive).
Buck
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government.
2024	IN 157—LS 6582/DI 134 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 157
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
taxation.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 6-1.1-50.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JANUARY 1, 2024 (RETROACTIVE)]:
4 Chapter 50.2. Vacation of a Public Highway Resulting in
5 Landlocked Property
6 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "landlocked property" means
7 real property that has been shut off from all public highways as a
8 result of the vacation of one (1) or more public highways.
9 Sec. 2. If an action of the state, or an agency or political
10 subdivision of the state, causes real property to become landlocked
11 property, either:
12 (1) the state must purchase the landlocked property from the
13 owner of the landlocked property at an amount equal to the
14 assessed value of the landlocked property in a time and
15 manner prescribed by the department; or
16 (2) the county assessor of the county in which the landlocked
17 property is located must assess the value of the landlocked
2024	IN 157—LS 6582/DI 134 2
1 property at an amount equal to zero (0) for as long as the
2 property qualifies as landlocked property.
3 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2024 (RETROACTIVE)]
4 (a) IC 6-1.1-50.2, as added by this act, applies to assessment dates
5 occurring after December 31, 2023.
6 (b) This SECTION expires January 1, 2027.
7 SECTION 3. An emergency is declared for this act.
2024	IN 157—LS 6582/DI 134