Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0157 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 6, 2024
Fiscal Note February 1, 2024
Fiscal Note January 30, 2024
Fiscal Note January 25, 2024
Bill January 8, 2024
Fiscal Note January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 30, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024