Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0157 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-*SB0157.2*
2-January 31, 2024
1+*SB0157.1*
2+January 26, 2024
33 SENATE BILL No. 157
44 _____
5-DIGEST OF SB 157 (Updated January 30, 2024 11:41 am - DI 129)
5+DIGEST OF SB 157 (Updated January 25, 2024 12:18 pm - DI 87)
66 Citations Affected: IC 6-1.1; noncode.
77 Synopsis: Landlocked property. Defines "landlocked property" as real
88 property that has been shut off from all public highways as a result of
99 the vacation of one or more public highways. Provides that if an action
1010 of the state, or an agency or political subdivision of the state, causes
1111 real property to become landlocked property, the county assessor of the
1212 county in which the landlocked property is located must assess the
1313 value of the landlocked property at zero for as long as the property
14-qualifies as landlocked property if the property owner files an affidavit
15-stating that the property does not have access to any public highway.
14+qualifies as landlocked property.
1615 Effective: January 1, 2024 (retroactive).
1716 Buck
1817 January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government.
1918 January 25, 2024, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass; reassigned to Committee on
2019 Tax and Fiscal Policy.
21-January 30, 2024, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass.
22-SB 157—LS 6582/DI 134 January 31, 2024
20+SB 157—LS 6582/DI 134 January 26, 2024
2321 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
2422 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2523 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2624 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2725 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2826 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2927 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
3028 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
3129 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
3230 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
3331 SENATE BILL No. 157
3432 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3533 taxation.
3634 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3735 1 SECTION 1. IC 6-1.1-50.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
3836 2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3937 3 JANUARY 1, 2024 (RETROACTIVE)]:
4038 4 Chapter 50.2. Vacation of a Public Highway Resulting in
4139 5 Landlocked Property
4240 6 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "landlocked property" means
4341 7 real property that has been shut off from all public highways as a
4442 8 result of the vacation of one (1) or more public highways.
4543 9 Sec. 2. If an action of the state, or an agency or political
4644 10 subdivision of the state, causes real property to become landlocked
4745 11 property, the county assessor of the county in which the landlocked
4846 12 property is located must assess the value of the landlocked
4947 13 property at an amount equal to zero (0) for as long as the property
50-14 qualifies as landlocked property, if the owner of the property
51-15 complies with section 3 of this chapter.
52-16 Sec. 3. The county assessor may only reduce the assessment of
53-17 a property under this chapter if the owner of the property files an
48+14 qualifies as landlocked property.
49+15 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2024 (RETROACTIVE)]
50+16 (a) IC 6-1.1-50.2, as added by this act, applies to assessment dates
51+17 occurring after December 31, 2023.
5452 SB 157—LS 6582/DI 134 2
55-1 affidavit with the county assessor stating that the property does not
56-2 have access to any public highway as a result of the state or an
57-3 agency or political subdivision of the state vacating one (1) or more
58-4 public highways. The affidavit must be signed under oath by the
59-5 owner of the property.
60-6 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2024 (RETROACTIVE)]
61-7 (a) IC 6-1.1-50.2, as added by this act, applies to assessment dates
62-8 occurring after December 31, 2023.
63-9 (b) This SECTION expires January 1, 2027.
64-10 SECTION 3. An emergency is declared for this act.
53+1 (b) This SECTION expires January 1, 2027.
54+2 SECTION 3. An emergency is declared for this act.
6555 SB 157—LS 6582/DI 134 3
6656 COMMITTEE REPORT
6757 Madam President: The Senate Committee on Local Government, to
6858 which was referred Senate Bill No. 157, has had the same under
6959 consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
7060 the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows:
7161 Page 1, line 11, delete "either:".
7262 Page 1, delete lines 12 through 15.
7363 Page 1, line 16, delete "(2)".
7464 Page 1, run in lines 11 through 16.
7565 and when so amended that said bill do pass and be reassigned to the
7666 Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy.
7767 (Reference is to SB 157 as introduced.)
7868 BUCK, Chairperson
7969 Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0.
80-_____
81-COMMITTEE REPORT
82-Madam President: The Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy,
83-to which was referred Senate Bill No. 157, has had the same under
84-consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
85-the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows:
86-Page 1, line 14, delete "property." and insert "property, if the
87-owner of the property complies with section 3 of this chapter.
88-Sec. 3. The county assessor may only reduce the assessment of
89-a property under this chapter if the owner of the property files an
90-affidavit with the county assessor stating that the property does not
91-have access to any public highway as a result of the state or an
92-agency or political subdivision of the state vacating one (1) or more
93-public highways. The affidavit must be signed under oath by the
94-owner of the property.".
95-and when so amended that said bill do pass.
96-(Reference is to SB 157 as printed January 26, 2024.)
97-HOLDMAN, Chairperson
98-Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0.
9970 SB 157—LS 6582/DI 134