Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0167 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 SENATE BILL No. 167
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 12-21-1-1.7.
77 Synopsis: Division of mental health and addiction matters. Prohibits
88 the division of mental health and addiction (division) from requiring
99 providers that are required to be accredited or certified by other entities
1010 to submit information to the division that would have been submitted
1111 to the accrediting or certifying body. Requires the division to establish
1212 a work group to discuss specified issues concerning audits and requires
1313 a report to be submitted before November 1, 2024.
1414 Effective: July 1, 2024.
1515 Alting, Crider, Becker
1616 January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Provider
1717 Services.
1818 2024 IN 167—LS 6563/DI 104 Introduced
1919 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
2020 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2121 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2222 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2323 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2424 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2525 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2626 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2727 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2828 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2929 SENATE BILL No. 167
3030 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3131 human services.
3232 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3333 1 SECTION 1. IC 12-21-1-1.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
3434 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3535 3 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.7. If the division requires a provider to be certified
3636 4 or accredited by another entity in order to provide services for a
3737 5 division program, the division may not require the provider to
3838 6 submit additional documentation and materials to the division that
3939 7 would have been required in the certification or accreditation
4040 8 process, other than proof of the accreditation or certification itself.
4141 9 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024] (a) Before August 1,
4242 10 2024, the division of mental health and addiction established by
4343 11 IC 12-21-1-1 shall establish a work group consisting of mental
4444 12 health providers that are subject to audits by the division. The
4545 13 work group shall discuss the following:
4646 14 (1) The types of audits by the division.
4747 15 (2) The reason for each audit.
4848 16 (3) The costs of the audits.
4949 17 (4) Whether any of the audits could be consolidated or
5050 2024 IN 167—LS 6563/DI 104 2
5151 1 eliminated.
5252 2 (b) Before November 1, 2024, the division shall submit a report
5353 3 to the legislative council in an electronic format under IC 5-14-6 of
5454 4 the following:
5555 5 (1) A summary of the work group's meetings.
5656 6 (2) Any recommendations concerning the work group's
5757 7 findings regarding the audits.
5858 8 (c) This SECTION expires December 31, 2024.
5959 2024 IN 167—LS 6563/DI 104