Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0167 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/08/2024

                             
Introduced Version
SENATE BILL No. 167
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 12-21-1-1.7.
Synopsis:  Division of mental health and addiction matters. Prohibits
the division of mental health and addiction (division) from requiring
providers that are required to be accredited or certified by other entities
to submit information to the division that would have been submitted
to the accrediting or certifying body. Requires the division to establish
a work group to discuss specified issues concerning audits and requires
a report to be submitted before November 1, 2024. 
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Alting, Crider, Becker
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Provider
Services.
2024	IN 167—LS 6563/DI 104 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 167
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
human services.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 12-21-1-1.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2024]: Sec. 1.7. If the division requires a provider to be certified
4 or accredited by another entity in order to provide services for a
5 division program, the division may not require the provider to
6 submit additional documentation and materials to the division that
7 would have been required in the certification or accreditation
8 process, other than proof of the accreditation or certification itself.
9 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024] (a) Before August 1,
10 2024, the division of mental health and addiction established by
11 IC 12-21-1-1 shall establish a work group consisting of mental
12 health providers that are subject to audits by the division. The
13 work group shall discuss the following:
14 (1) The types of audits by the division.
15 (2) The reason for each audit.
16 (3) The costs of the audits.
17 (4) Whether any of the audits could be consolidated or
2024	IN 167—LS 6563/DI 104 2
1 eliminated.
2 (b) Before November 1, 2024, the division shall submit a report
3 to the legislative council in an electronic format under IC 5-14-6 of
4 the following:
5 (1) A summary of the work group's meetings.
6 (2) Any recommendations concerning the work group's
7 findings regarding the audits.
8 (c) This SECTION expires December 31, 2024.
2024	IN 167—LS 6563/DI 104