Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0174 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/09/2024

                             
Introduced Version
SENATE BILL No. 174
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 5-20-11.
Synopsis:  Access to food program. Establishes the access to nutritious
food program (program) under the administration of the Indiana
housing and community development authority (IHCDA). Provides that
the purpose of the program is to focus on: (1) distribution of fresh and
nutritious food; and (2) education in food preparation and nutrition; in
food deserts. Defines "food desert". Requires the IHCDA to convene
an annual meeting to share best practices and information concerning
effective programs and submit an annual report to the lieutenant
governor and legislative council.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Yoder
January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Provider
Services.
2024	IN 174—LS 6379/DI 120 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 174
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
human services.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 5-20-11 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS
2 A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2024]:
4 Chapter 11. Access to Nutritious Food Program
5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "authority" refers to the Indiana
6 housing and community development authority created by
7 IC 5-20-1-3.
8 Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "food desert" means an
9 underserved geographic area where fresh and nutritious foods are
10 difficult to obtain, as determined by the authority. The term
11 includes:
12 (1) a rural town or urban neighborhood in which:
13 (A) at least twenty-five percent (25%) of the households
14 have incomes that are below the federal income poverty
15 level (as defined in IC 12-15-2-1); or
16 (B) the median family income of residents is not more than
17 eighty percent (80%) of the median family income of
2024	IN 174—LS 6379/DI 120 2
1 Indiana;
2 (2) a rural town, urban neighborhood, or metropolitan census
3 tract in which at least five hundred (500) residents or at least
4 thirty-three percent (33%) of the population resides more
5 than one (1) mile from a supermarket or large grocery store;
6 and
7 (3) a nonmetropolitan census tract in which at least five
8 hundred (500) residents or at least thirty-three percent (33%)
9 of the population resides more than ten (10) miles from a
10 supermarket or large grocery store.
11 Sec. 3. As used in this chapter, "program" refers to the access
12 to nutritious food program conducted under section 4 of this
13 chapter.
14 Sec. 4. (a) The authority shall conduct an access to nutritious
15 food program to establish and operate projects and strategies that
16 focus on:
17 (1) distribution of fresh and nutritious food; and
18 (2) education in food preparation and nutrition;
19 in food deserts.
20 (b) The authority shall promote the sharing of information
21 concerning best practices and programs, including projects under
22 this chapter, that have proven to be effective in improving
23 distribution of fresh and nutritious food and education in food
24 preparation and nutrition in food deserts.
25 Sec. 5. (a) Not later than November 1, 2024, and each November
26 1 thereafter, the authority shall convene an annual meeting of
27 nonprofit organizations and other interested parties to share best
28 practices and information on programs, including projects under
29 this chapter, that have proven to be effective in improving
30 distribution of fresh and nutritious food and education in food
31 preparation and nutrition in food deserts.
32 (b) Not later than December 1, 2024, and each December 1
33 thereafter, the authority shall submit to the lieutenant governor
34 and legislative council in an electronic format under IC 5-14-6 a
35 report concerning the annual meeting described in subsection (a),
36 including the information shared on best practices and programs
37 that have proven to be effective in improving distribution of fresh
38 and nutritious food and education in food preparation and
39 nutrition in food deserts.
2024	IN 174—LS 6379/DI 120