1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | Introduced Version |
---|
3 | 3 | | SENATE BILL No. 175 |
---|
4 | 4 | | _____ |
---|
5 | 5 | | DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL |
---|
6 | 6 | | Citations Affected: IC 24-4-21-4. |
---|
7 | 7 | | Synopsis: Packaging for low THC hemp extract. Provides that after |
---|
8 | 8 | | June 30, 2024, the packaging of low THC hemp extract may not: (1) |
---|
9 | 9 | | contain certain statements, artwork, or designs that could reasonably |
---|
10 | 10 | | mislead any person to believe that the package contains anything other |
---|
11 | 11 | | than low THC hemp extract; (2) bear the likeness or contain a |
---|
12 | 12 | | cartoon-like characteristic of a real or fictional person, animal, or fruit |
---|
13 | 13 | | that appeals to children; or (3) bear unauthorized trademarks, trade |
---|
14 | 14 | | names, famous marks, or other identifying marks. Provides that after |
---|
15 | 15 | | June 30, 2024, the packaging of low THC hemp extract shall: (1) be |
---|
16 | 16 | | child proof; (2) be tamper evident; and (3) contain a disclosure |
---|
17 | 17 | | statement. |
---|
18 | 18 | | Effective: July 1, 2024. |
---|
19 | 19 | | Yoder |
---|
20 | 20 | | January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology. |
---|
21 | 21 | | 2024 IN 175—LS 6759/DI 116 Introduced |
---|
22 | 22 | | Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) |
---|
23 | 23 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
24 | 24 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
25 | 25 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
26 | 26 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
27 | 27 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
28 | 28 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
29 | 29 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
30 | 30 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
31 | 31 | | between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SENATE BILL No. 175 |
---|
33 | 33 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning trade |
---|
34 | 34 | | regulation. |
---|
35 | 35 | | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: |
---|
36 | 36 | | 1 SECTION 1. IC 24-4-21-4, AS ADDED BY P.L.153-2018, |
---|
37 | 37 | | 2 SECTION 9, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
38 | 38 | | 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 4. (a) Except as provided in subsection (b), Low |
---|
39 | 39 | | 4 THC hemp extract must be distributed in packaging that contains the |
---|
40 | 40 | | 5 following information: |
---|
41 | 41 | | 6 (1) A scannable bar code or QR code linked to a document that |
---|
42 | 42 | | 7 contains information with respect to the manufacture of the low |
---|
43 | 43 | | 8 THC hemp extract, including the: |
---|
44 | 44 | | 9 (A) batch identification number; |
---|
45 | 45 | | 10 (B) product name; |
---|
46 | 46 | | 11 (C) batch date; |
---|
47 | 47 | | 12 (D) expiration date, which must be not more than two (2) years |
---|
48 | 48 | | 13 from the date of manufacture; |
---|
49 | 49 | | 14 (E) batch size; |
---|
50 | 50 | | 15 (F) total quantity produced; |
---|
51 | 51 | | 16 (G) ingredients used, including the: |
---|
52 | 52 | | 17 (i) ingredient name; |
---|
53 | 53 | | 2024 IN 175—LS 6759/DI 116 2 |
---|
54 | 54 | | 1 (ii) name of the company that manufactured the ingredient; |
---|
55 | 55 | | 2 (iii) company or product identification number or code, if |
---|
56 | 56 | | 3 applicable; and |
---|
57 | 57 | | 4 (iv) ingredient lot number; and |
---|
58 | 58 | | 5 (H) download link for a certificate of analysis for the low THC |
---|
59 | 59 | | 6 hemp extract. |
---|
60 | 60 | | 7 (2) The batch number. |
---|
61 | 61 | | 8 (3) The Internet address of a web site website to obtain batch |
---|
62 | 62 | | 9 information. |
---|
63 | 63 | | 10 (4) The expiration date. |
---|
64 | 64 | | 11 (5) The number of milligrams of low THC hemp extract. |
---|
65 | 65 | | 12 (6) The manufacturer. |
---|
66 | 66 | | 13 (7) The fact that the product contains not more than three-tenths |
---|
67 | 67 | | 14 percent (0.3%) total delta-9-tetrahydrocannabinol (THC), |
---|
68 | 68 | | 15 including precursors, by weight. |
---|
69 | 69 | | 16 (b) Before July 1, 2018, low THC hemp extract may be distributed |
---|
70 | 70 | | 17 in Indiana without having met the requirements described in subsection |
---|
71 | 71 | | 18 (a). |
---|
72 | 72 | | 19 (b) After June 30, 2024, the packaging of low THC hemp |
---|
73 | 73 | | 20 extract: |
---|
74 | 74 | | 21 (1) may not: |
---|
75 | 75 | | 22 (A) contain any statement, artwork, or design that could |
---|
76 | 76 | | 23 reasonably mislead any person to believe that the package |
---|
77 | 77 | | 24 contains anything other than low THC hemp extract; |
---|
78 | 78 | | 25 (B) bear the likeness or contain a cartoon-like |
---|
79 | 79 | | 26 characteristic of a real or fictional person, animal, or fruit |
---|
80 | 80 | | 27 that appeals to children; or |
---|
81 | 81 | | 28 (C) bear an unauthorized trademark, trade name, famous |
---|
82 | 82 | | 29 mark, or other identifying mark, imprint, or device, or any |
---|
83 | 83 | | 30 likeness thereof; and |
---|
84 | 84 | | 31 (2) shall: |
---|
85 | 85 | | 32 (A) have the child resistant effectiveness set forth in the |
---|
86 | 86 | | 33 federal poison prevention packaging standards, 16 CFR |
---|
87 | 87 | | 34 1700.15(b)(1); |
---|
88 | 88 | | 35 (B) be tamper evident (as defined in IC 7.1-7-4-6(2)); and |
---|
89 | 89 | | 36 (C) contain, in all capital letters in at least a 12 point bold |
---|
90 | 90 | | 37 font the following statement: "THIS PRODUCT |
---|
91 | 91 | | 38 CONTAINS CANNABIS, A SCHEDULE I |
---|
92 | 92 | | 39 CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE. KEEP OUT OF REACH |
---|
93 | 93 | | 40 OF CHILDREN AND ANIMALS. THE INTOXICATING |
---|
94 | 94 | | 41 EFFECTS OF CANNABIS PRODUCTS MAY BE |
---|
95 | 95 | | 42 DELAYED UP TO TWO HOURS. CANNABIS USE |
---|
96 | 96 | | 2024 IN 175—LS 6759/DI 116 3 |
---|
97 | 97 | | 1 WHILE PREGNANT OR BREASTFEEDING MAY BE |
---|
98 | 98 | | 2 HARMFUL. CONSUMPTION OF CANNABIS |
---|
99 | 99 | | 3 PRODUCTS IMPAIRS YOUR ABILITY TO DRIVE AND |
---|
100 | 100 | | 4 OPERATE MACHINERY. PLEASE USE EXTREME |
---|
101 | 101 | | 5 CAUTION.". |
---|
102 | 102 | | 2024 IN 175—LS 6759/DI 116 |
---|