Introduced Version SENATE BILL No. 175 _____ DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL Citations Affected: IC 24-4-21-4. Synopsis: Packaging for low THC hemp extract. Provides that after June 30, 2024, the packaging of low THC hemp extract may not: (1) contain certain statements, artwork, or designs that could reasonably mislead any person to believe that the package contains anything other than low THC hemp extract; (2) bear the likeness or contain a cartoon-like characteristic of a real or fictional person, animal, or fruit that appeals to children; or (3) bear unauthorized trademarks, trade names, famous marks, or other identifying marks. Provides that after June 30, 2024, the packaging of low THC hemp extract shall: (1) be child proof; (2) be tamper evident; and (3) contain a disclosure statement. Effective: July 1, 2024. Yoder January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology. 2024 IN 175—LS 6759/DI 116 Introduced Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. SENATE BILL No. 175 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning trade regulation. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 24-4-21-4, AS ADDED BY P.L.153-2018, 2 SECTION 9, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 4. (a) Except as provided in subsection (b), Low 4 THC hemp extract must be distributed in packaging that contains the 5 following information: 6 (1) A scannable bar code or QR code linked to a document that 7 contains information with respect to the manufacture of the low 8 THC hemp extract, including the: 9 (A) batch identification number; 10 (B) product name; 11 (C) batch date; 12 (D) expiration date, which must be not more than two (2) years 13 from the date of manufacture; 14 (E) batch size; 15 (F) total quantity produced; 16 (G) ingredients used, including the: 17 (i) ingredient name; 2024 IN 175—LS 6759/DI 116 2 1 (ii) name of the company that manufactured the ingredient; 2 (iii) company or product identification number or code, if 3 applicable; and 4 (iv) ingredient lot number; and 5 (H) download link for a certificate of analysis for the low THC 6 hemp extract. 7 (2) The batch number. 8 (3) The Internet address of a web site website to obtain batch 9 information. 10 (4) The expiration date. 11 (5) The number of milligrams of low THC hemp extract. 12 (6) The manufacturer. 13 (7) The fact that the product contains not more than three-tenths 14 percent (0.3%) total delta-9-tetrahydrocannabinol (THC), 15 including precursors, by weight. 16 (b) Before July 1, 2018, low THC hemp extract may be distributed 17 in Indiana without having met the requirements described in subsection 18 (a). 19 (b) After June 30, 2024, the packaging of low THC hemp 20 extract: 21 (1) may not: 22 (A) contain any statement, artwork, or design that could 23 reasonably mislead any person to believe that the package 24 contains anything other than low THC hemp extract; 25 (B) bear the likeness or contain a cartoon-like 26 characteristic of a real or fictional person, animal, or fruit 27 that appeals to children; or 28 (C) bear an unauthorized trademark, trade name, famous 29 mark, or other identifying mark, imprint, or device, or any 30 likeness thereof; and 31 (2) shall: 32 (A) have the child resistant effectiveness set forth in the 33 federal poison prevention packaging standards, 16 CFR 34 1700.15(b)(1); 35 (B) be tamper evident (as defined in IC 7.1-7-4-6(2)); and 36 (C) contain, in all capital letters in at least a 12 point bold 37 font the following statement: "THIS PRODUCT 38 CONTAINS CANNABIS, A SCHEDULE I 39 CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE. KEEP OUT OF REACH 40 OF CHILDREN AND ANIMALS. THE INTOXICATING 41 EFFECTS OF CANNABIS PRODUCTS MAY BE 42 DELAYED UP TO TWO HOURS. CANNABIS USE 2024 IN 175—LS 6759/DI 116 3 1 WHILE PREGNANT OR BREASTFEEDING MAY BE 2 HARMFUL. CONSUMPTION OF CANNABIS 3 PRODUCTS IMPAIRS YOUR ABILITY TO DRIVE AND 4 OPERATE MACHINERY. PLEASE USE EXTREME 5 CAUTION.". 2024 IN 175—LS 6759/DI 116