Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 111
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 309: yeas 35, nays 13
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 330: yeas 91, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Pol, Glick and Brown L
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Koch and Randolph Lonnie M
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Steuerwald, Negele, Gore and Pryor
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House conferees appointed: McNamara and Hatcher
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 96, nays 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Steuerwald, Negele, Hatcher
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative McNamara
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Senators Koch, Brown L, Glick
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Pol
|
|
|