Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 11, 2024
Fiscal Note March 4, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Fiscal Note January 30, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 26, 2024
Fiscal Note January 19, 2024
Fiscal Note January 12, 2024
Bill January 9, 2024
Fiscal Note January 9, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 27, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024