House | 02/13/2024 | Representative Hamilton added as cosponsor | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | House sponsor: Representative McGuire | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 50: yeas 41, nays 8 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Senator Yoder added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Senator Walker G added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Senator Bassler added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Authored by Senator Deery |