Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0214 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-*SB0214.1*
2-February 2, 2024
1+
2+Introduced Version
33 SENATE BILL No. 214
44 _____
5-DIGEST OF SB 214 (Updated January 31, 2024 4:15 pm - DI 152)
6-Citations Affected: IC 20-26.
5+DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
6+Citations Affected: IC 20-26-5-44.5.
77 Synopsis: Student mental health resources. Requires the department
8-of education, in consultation with the office of the secretary of family
9-and social services, to approve and make available student mental
10-health resources for certain schools. Requires the governing body of a
11-school corporation or the equivalent authority for a charter school to
12-publish and publicly post the approved student mental health resources.
8+of education to approve and make available student mental health
9+resources for certain schools. Requires the governing body of a school
10+corporation or the equivalent authority for a charter school to publish
11+and publicly post the approved student mental health resources.
1312 Effective: Upon passage.
14-Alexander, Crider
13+Alexander
1514 January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education and Career
1615 Development.
17-February 1, 2024, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass.
18-SB 214—LS 6652/DI 152 February 2, 2024
16+2024 IN 214—LS 6652/DI 152 Introduced
1917 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
2018 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2119 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2220 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2321 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2422 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2523 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2624 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2725 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2826 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2927 SENATE BILL No. 214
3028 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3129 education.
3230 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3331 1 SECTION 1. IC 20-26-5-44.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
3432 2 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3533 3 [EFFECTIVE UPON PASSAGE]: Sec. 44.5. (a) As used in this
3634 4 section, "school" means the following:
3735 5 (1) A school maintained by a school corporation.
3836 6 (2) A charter school.
3937 7 (b) Not later than July 15, 2024, and each July 15 thereafter, the
40-8 department shall approve, in consultation with the office of the
41-9 secretary of family and social services, and make available to a
42-10 school student mental health resources on the following subjects:
43-11 (1) Youth suicide.
44-12 (2) Human trafficking.
45-13 (3) Interpersonal violence.
46-14 (4) Child abuse and neglect.
47-15 (5) Substance abuse.
48-16 (6) Any other subject concerning student mental health that
49-17 the department considers appropriate.
50-SB 214—LS 6652/DI 152 2
51-1 (c) The governing body of a school corporation or the equivalent
52-2 authority for a charter school shall:
53-3 (1) publish the student mental health resources approved
54-4 under subsection (b) on the school:
55-5 (A) website; and
56-6 (B) social media platforms; and
57-7 (2) post a hard copy of the student mental health resources
58-8 approved under subsection (b) in a location that is visible and
59-9 accessible to all students of the school.
60-10 (d) Nothing in this section shall be construed to prevent the
61-11 governing body of a school corporation or the equivalent authority
62-12 for a charter school from publishing or posting mental health
63-13 resources in addition to the student mental health resources
64-14 approved by the department under subsection (b).
65-15 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
66-SB 214—LS 6652/DI 152 3
67-COMMITTEE REPORT
68-Madam President: The Senate Committee on Education and Career
69-Development, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 214, has had the
70-same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
71-Senate with the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as
72-follows:
73-Page 1, line 8, delete "approve" and insert "approve, in
74-consultation with the office of the secretary of family and social
75-services,".
76-and when so amended that said bill do pass.
77-(Reference is to SB 214 as introduced.)
78-RAATZ, Chairperson
79-Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0.
80-SB 214—LS 6652/DI 152
38+8 department shall approve and make available to a school student
39+9 mental health resources on the following subjects:
40+10 (1) Youth suicide.
41+11 (2) Human trafficking.
42+12 (3) Interpersonal violence.
43+13 (4) Child abuse and neglect.
44+14 (5) Substance abuse.
45+15 (6) Any other subject concerning student mental health that
46+16 the department considers appropriate.
47+17 (c) The governing body of a school corporation or the equivalent
48+2024 IN 214—LS 6652/DI 152 2
49+1 authority for a charter school shall:
50+2 (1) publish the student mental health resources approved
51+3 under subsection (b) on the school:
52+4 (A) website; and
53+5 (B) social media platforms; and
54+6 (2) post a hard copy of the student mental health resources
55+7 approved under subsection (b) in a location that is visible and
56+8 accessible to all students of the school.
57+9 (d) Nothing in this section shall be construed to prevent the
58+10 governing body of a school corporation or the equivalent authority
59+11 for a charter school from publishing or posting mental health
60+12 resources in addition to the student mental health resources
61+13 approved by the department under subsection (b).
62+14 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
63+2024 IN 214—LS 6652/DI 152