Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0214 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 02/01/2024

                            *SB0214.1*
February 2, 2024
SENATE BILL No. 214
_____
DIGEST OF SB 214 (Updated January 31, 2024 4:15 pm - DI 152)
Citations Affected:  IC 20-26.
Synopsis:  Student mental health resources. Requires the department
of education, in consultation with the office of the secretary of family
and social services, to approve and make available student mental
health resources for certain schools. Requires the governing body of a
school corporation or the equivalent authority for a charter school to
publish and publicly post the approved student mental health resources.
Effective:  Upon passage.
Alexander, Crider
January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education and Career
Development.
February 1, 2024, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass.
SB 214—LS 6652/DI 152  February 2, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 214
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
education.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 20-26-5-44.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
2 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3 [EFFECTIVE UPON PASSAGE]: Sec. 44.5. (a) As used in this
4 section, "school" means the following:
5 (1) A school maintained by a school corporation.
6 (2) A charter school.
7 (b) Not later than July 15, 2024, and each July 15 thereafter, the
8 department shall approve, in consultation with the office of the
9 secretary of family and social services, and make available to a
10 school student mental health resources on the following subjects:
11 (1) Youth suicide.
12 (2) Human trafficking.
13 (3) Interpersonal violence.
14 (4) Child abuse and neglect.
15 (5) Substance abuse.
16 (6) Any other subject concerning student mental health that
17 the department considers appropriate.
SB 214—LS 6652/DI 152 2
1 (c) The governing body of a school corporation or the equivalent
2 authority for a charter school shall:
3 (1) publish the student mental health resources approved
4 under subsection (b) on the school:
5 (A) website; and
6 (B) social media platforms; and
7 (2) post a hard copy of the student mental health resources
8 approved under subsection (b) in a location that is visible and
9 accessible to all students of the school.
10 (d) Nothing in this section shall be construed to prevent the
11 governing body of a school corporation or the equivalent authority
12 for a charter school from publishing or posting mental health
13 resources in addition to the student mental health resources
14 approved by the department under subsection (b).
15 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
SB 214—LS 6652/DI 152 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Education and Career
Development, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 214, has had the
same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
Senate with the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as
follows:
Page 1, line 8, delete "approve" and insert "approve, in
consultation with the office of the secretary of family and social
services,".
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to SB 214 as introduced.)
RAATZ, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0.
SB 214—LS 6652/DI 152