Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 28
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 235: yeas 42, nays 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 176: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Becker added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Abbott, Morris, Judy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 87: yeas 47, nays 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Walker K) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Freeman added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Carrasco added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Messmer added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Senator Walker K
|
|
|