Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 1, 2024
Fiscal Note February 20, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Fiscal Note February 16, 2024
Fiscal Note February 2, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 26, 2024
Fiscal Note January 24, 2024
Fiscal Note January 9, 2024
Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill January 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024