Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Public Law 78
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Porter added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 161: yeas 88, nays 6
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 151: yeas 27, nays 54
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Lehman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 136: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Gaskill added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Walker G added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Senator Bassler
|
|
|