Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0221 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Fiscal Note February 13, 2024
Fiscal Note February 6, 2024
Fiscal Note February 5, 2024
Fiscal Note January 30, 2024
Bill January 9, 2024
Fiscal Note January 9, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024