House | 02/06/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Cosponsor: Representative Lindauer | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Karickhoff | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 45, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Amendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Amendment #2 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senator Pol added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senator Rogers added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Senator Doriot added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Authored by Senator Messmer |