*SB0223.1* January 19, 2024 SENATE BILL No. 223 _____ DIGEST OF SB 223 (Updated January 17, 2024 12:35 pm - DI 153) Citations Affected: IC 2-5. Synopsis: Construction workforce task force. Establishes the building Indiana's construction workforce task force (task force). Establishes quorum and voting rules for the task force. Provides that the task force is otherwise subject to the law governing study committees and the policies and rules of the legislative council. Specifies topics for the task force to review. Provides that the task force expires December 31, 2027. Effective: Upon passage. Messmer, Doriot January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor. January 18, 2024, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass. SB 223—LS 6377/DI 92 January 19, 2024 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. SENATE BILL No. 223 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning the general assembly. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 2-5-56 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS 2 A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE UPON 3 PASSAGE]: 4 Chapter 56. Building Indiana's Construction Workforce Task 5 Force 6 Sec. 1. The definitions set forth in IC 2-5-1.2 apply to this 7 chapter. 8 Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "task force" refers to the 9 building Indiana's construction workforce task force established by 10 section 3 of this chapter. 11 Sec. 3. The building Indiana's construction workforce task force 12 is established. 13 Sec. 4. Except as otherwise provided in this chapter, the task 14 force is subject to IC 2-5-1.2 and the policies and rules of the 15 legislative council. 16 Sec. 5. The task force consists of the following sixteen (16) 17 members: SB 223—LS 6377/DI 92 2 1 (1) Two (2) members of the senate appointed by the president 2 pro tempore of the senate. 3 (2) A member of the senate appointed by the minority leader 4 of the senate. 5 (3) Two (2) members of the house appointed by the speaker. 6 (4) A member of the house appointed by the minority leader 7 of the house. 8 (5) An employee of the department of labor appointed by the 9 governor. 10 (6) A member representing counties appointed by the 11 governor after considering the recommendation of the 12 Association of Indiana Counties. 13 (7) A member representing municipalities appointed by the 14 governor after considering the recommendation of Accelerate 15 Indiana Municipalities. 16 (8) A member representing construction workers appointed 17 by the governor after considering the recommendation of the 18 Indiana State Building and Construction Trades Council. 19 (9) A member representing plumbing, heating, and cooling 20 contractors appointed by the governor after considering the 21 recommendation of the Indiana Association of Plumbing 22 Heating Cooling Contractors. 23 (10) A member representing builders and contractors 24 appointed by the governor after considering the 25 recommendation of the Associated Builders and Contractors 26 of Indiana/Kentucky and the Indiana Building Contractors 27 Alliance. 28 (11) A member representing high school career and technical 29 education educators appointed by the governor after 30 considering the recommendation of the Indiana Association 31 of Career and Technical Education Districts. 32 (12) The president of Ivy Tech Community College or the 33 president's designee. 34 (13) The president of Vincennes University or the president's 35 designee. 36 (14) A member representing the construction industry 37 appointed by the governor after considering the 38 recommendation of the Indiana Construction Roundtable 39 Foundation. 40 A member appointed under subdivisions (5) through (14) may not 41 be a member of the general assembly. 42 Sec. 6. (a) Subject to subsection (c), the initial term of a SB 223—LS 6377/DI 92 3 1 legislative member of the task force expires June 30, 2025. A 2 legislative member may be reappointed to a successive term. Each 3 successive term expires December 31, 2027. 4 (b) Subject to subsection (c), the term of a member of the task 5 force appointed by the governor expires December 31, 2027. 6 (c) A member of the task force serves at the pleasure of the 7 appointing authority. 8 Sec. 7. The appropriate appointing authority shall fill a vacancy 9 on the task force in accordance with IC 2-5-1.2-9. 10 Sec. 8. Nine (9) members of the task force constitute a quorum. 11 The affirmative vote of a majority of the members present at a task 12 force meeting is necessary for the task force to take official action 13 other than to meet and take testimony. 14 Sec. 9. Subject to IC 2-5-1.2, the task force shall meet at the call 15 of the chair. 16 Sec. 10. (a) A lay or legislative member of the task force is 17 entitled to receive the same per diem, mileage, and travel 18 allowances paid to legislative members of interim study committees 19 established by the legislative council. 20 (b) A member of the task force who is: 21 (1) a state employee; and 22 (2) not a member of the general assembly; 23 is not entitled to a per diem. However, the member is entitled to 24 reimbursement for traveling expenses as provided under 25 IC 4-13-1-4 and other expenses actually incurred in connection 26 with the member's duties as provided in the state policies and 27 procedures established by the Indiana department of 28 administration and approved by the budget agency. 29 (c) Amounts paid under this section shall be paid from 30 appropriations made to the legislative council or the legislative 31 services agency. 32 Sec. 11. The task force shall review the following: 33 (1) Construction workforce trends in rural, suburban, and 34 urban communities in Indiana. 35 (2) Wages of and wage trends affecting construction workers 36 in Indiana. 37 (3) Methods and resources available for workforce 38 development in the construction industry. 39 (4) The availability of construction workforce training in K-12 40 schools. 41 (5) The availability of construction workforce training in 42 postsecondary educational institutions. SB 223—LS 6377/DI 92 4 1 (6) The available capacity of construction training programs. 2 (7) Recruiting efforts to increase participation in the available 3 programs. 4 Sec. 12. The task force shall annually report its findings and 5 recommendations concerning the topics reviewed under section 11 6 of this chapter to the legislative council in an electronic format 7 under IC 5-14-6 before November 1 of each year. 8 Sec. 13. This chapter expires December 31, 2027. 9 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act. SB 223—LS 6377/DI 92 5 COMMITTEE REPORT Madam President: The Senate Committee on Pensions and Labor, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 223, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows: Page 1, line 16, delete "fifteen (15)" and insert "sixteen (16)". Page 2, between lines 35 and 36, begin a new line block indented and insert: "(14) A member representing the construction industry appointed by the governor after considering the recommendation of the Indiana Construction Roundtable Foundation.". Page 2, line 36, delete "(13)" and insert "(14)". Page 3, line 6, delete "Eight (8)" and insert "Nine (9)". and when so amended that said bill do pass. (Reference is to SB 223 as introduced.) DORIOT Committee Vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0. SB 223—LS 6377/DI 92