House | 02/20/2024 | Representatives McNamara and Andrade added as cosponsors | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senator Baldwin added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 45, nays 3 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senator Carrasco added as second author | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Amendment #3 (Pol) failed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Amendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Authored by Senator Freeman |