Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 32
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 178: yeas 65, nays 26
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Porter) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Baird, Prescott, Bartels
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Lindauer
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 53: yeas 40, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Taylor G) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Taylor G) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Byrne added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Johnson T added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Messmer added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Garten added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Crider added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Authored by Senator Baldwin
|
|
|