Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0242 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/10/2024

                             
Introduced Version
SENATE BILL No. 242
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 12-15-13-10.
Synopsis:  Medicaid pregnancy related reimbursement rates. Sets forth
increases in Medicaid reimbursement rates for: (1) prenatal obstetric
and gynecological services; (2) pregnancy delivery care services; and
(3) postnatal care services. 
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Bohacek
January 10, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Provider
Services.
2024	IN 242—LS 6326/DI 104 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 242
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
Medicaid.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 12-15-13-10 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
2 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 10. (a) This section is:
4 (1) subject to the availability of federal matching funds; and
5 (2) in addition to, and does not include, outlier payments
6 made by the office for the services described in this section.
7 (b) Beginning July 1, 2024, and subject to subsection (e), the
8 office shall increase reimbursement rates for prenatal obstetric
9 and gynecological services as follows:
10 (1) By increasing the rate by at least forty-four percent (44%)
11 from the reimbursement rate for the service on December 31,
12 2023.
13 (2) On January 1 of each year, by adjusting the rate described
14 in subdivision (1) by the most recent reported Social Security
15 cost of living adjustment rate.
16 (c) Beginning July 1, 2024, and subject to subsection (e), the
17 office shall increase reimbursement rates for pregnancy delivery
2024	IN 242—LS 6326/DI 104 2
1 care services as follows:
2 (1) By increasing the rate by at least ten percent (10%) from
3 the reimbursement rate for the service on December 31, 2023.
4 (2) On January 1 of each year, by adjusting the rate described
5 in subdivision (1) by the most recent reported Social Security
6 cost of living adjustment rate.
7 (d) Beginning July 1, 2024, and subject to subsection (e), the
8 office shall increase reimbursement rates for postnatal care
9 services as follows:
10 (1) By increasing the rate by at least ten percent (10%) from
11 the reimbursement rate for the service on December 31, 2023.
12 (2) On January 1 of each year, by adjusting the rate described
13 in subdivision (1) by the most recent reported Social Security
14 cost of living adjustment rate.
15 (e) If the office determines that the increase in reimbursement
16 rates described in this section would result in the state not being
17 able to obtain federal matching funds, the office shall increase the
18 reimbursement to the greatest amount that would allow for federal
19 matching funds.
2024	IN 242—LS 6326/DI 104