Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0247 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 1, 2024
Fiscal Note February 20, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Fiscal Note February 13, 2024
Fiscal Note January 30, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 26, 2024
Fiscal Note January 10, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill January 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024