1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | Introduced Version |
---|
3 | 3 | | SENATE BILL No. 269 |
---|
4 | 4 | | _____ |
---|
5 | 5 | | DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL |
---|
6 | 6 | | Citations Affected: IC 27-8-14.3. |
---|
7 | 7 | | Synopsis: Coverage for doula services. Requires a health plan (an |
---|
8 | 8 | | accident and sickness insurance policy or a health maintenance |
---|
9 | 9 | | organization contract) to provide coverage for doula services if: (1) the |
---|
10 | 10 | | services provided are within the doula's area of professional |
---|
11 | 11 | | competence; and (2) the health plan would provide coverage for those |
---|
12 | 12 | | services if the services were provided by any other health care provider. |
---|
13 | 13 | | Effective: July 1, 2024. |
---|
14 | 14 | | Vinzant |
---|
15 | 15 | | January 16, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial |
---|
16 | 16 | | Institutions. |
---|
17 | 17 | | 2024 IN 269—LS 6971/DI 55 Introduced |
---|
18 | 18 | | Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) |
---|
19 | 19 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
20 | 20 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
21 | 21 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
22 | 22 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
23 | 23 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
24 | 24 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
25 | 25 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
26 | 26 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
27 | 27 | | between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
28 | 28 | | SENATE BILL No. 269 |
---|
29 | 29 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning |
---|
30 | 30 | | insurance. |
---|
31 | 31 | | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: |
---|
32 | 32 | | 1 SECTION 1. IC 27-8-14.3 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE |
---|
33 | 33 | | 2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
34 | 34 | | 3 JULY 1, 2024]: |
---|
35 | 35 | | 4 Chapter 14.3. Coverage for Doula Services |
---|
36 | 36 | | 5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "doula" means an individual |
---|
37 | 37 | | 6 who: |
---|
38 | 38 | | 7 (1) is trained and certified by a nationally recognized |
---|
39 | 39 | | 8 institution in providing emotional and physical support, but |
---|
40 | 40 | | 9 not medical or midwife care, to pregnant individuals before, |
---|
41 | 41 | | 10 during, and after childbirth; and |
---|
42 | 42 | | 11 (2) may also provide assistance by referring childbearing |
---|
43 | 43 | | 12 individuals to community-based organizations and certified |
---|
44 | 44 | | 13 and licensed perinatal professionals in other disciplines. |
---|
45 | 45 | | 14 Sec. 2. (a) As used in this chapter, "health plan" means either of |
---|
46 | 46 | | 15 the following: |
---|
47 | 47 | | 16 (1) A policy of accident and sickness insurance (as defined in |
---|
48 | 48 | | 17 IC 27-8-5-1(a)), excluding the types of insurance and plans set |
---|
49 | 49 | | 2024 IN 269—LS 6971/DI 55 2 |
---|
50 | 50 | | 1 forth in IC 27-8-5-2.5(a), that is issued, entered into, or |
---|
51 | 51 | | 2 renewed after June 30, 2024. |
---|
52 | 52 | | 3 (2) A contract with a health maintenance organization (as |
---|
53 | 53 | | 4 defined in IC 27-13-1-19) that provides coverage for basic |
---|
54 | 54 | | 5 health care services (as defined in IC 27-13-1-4) and that is |
---|
55 | 55 | | 6 entered into or renewed after June 30, 2024. |
---|
56 | 56 | | 7 (b) The term includes a person that administers: |
---|
57 | 57 | | 8 (1) a policy described in subsection (a)(1); or |
---|
58 | 58 | | 9 (2) a contract described in subsection (a)(2). |
---|
59 | 59 | | 10 Sec. 3. (a) A health plan shall provide coverage for services |
---|
60 | 60 | | 11 provided by a doula in accordance with the health plan's principles |
---|
61 | 61 | | 12 and mechanisms of reimbursement, credentialing, and contracting |
---|
62 | 62 | | 13 if: |
---|
63 | 63 | | 14 (1) the services are within the doula's area of professional |
---|
64 | 64 | | 15 competence; and |
---|
65 | 65 | | 16 (2) the health plan would provide coverage for those services |
---|
66 | 66 | | 17 if the services were provided by any other health care |
---|
67 | 67 | | 18 provider. |
---|
68 | 68 | | 19 (b) A health plan may not require supervision, a signature, or |
---|
69 | 69 | | 20 referral by any other health care provider as a condition of |
---|
70 | 70 | | 21 reimbursement for doula services, except when those requirements |
---|
71 | 71 | | 22 are also applicable to other categories of health care providers. |
---|
72 | 72 | | 23 (c) This section does not require a health plan to pay for |
---|
73 | 73 | | 24 duplicate services actually rendered by both a doula and any other |
---|
74 | 74 | | 25 health care provider. |
---|
75 | 75 | | 26 (d) The department shall adopt rules under IC 4-22-2 to require |
---|
76 | 76 | | 27 the reporting to the department of utilization and cost information |
---|
77 | 77 | | 28 related to doula services covered under this section. |
---|
78 | 78 | | 29 (e) Beginning July 1, 2025, every year on or before July 1, a |
---|
79 | 79 | | 30 health plan required to cover doula services under this section shall |
---|
80 | 80 | | 31 report to the department utilization and cost information related |
---|
81 | 81 | | 32 to the doula services covered by the health plan. |
---|
82 | 82 | | 2024 IN 269—LS 6971/DI 55 |
---|