Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0269 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/11/2024

                             
Introduced Version
SENATE BILL No. 269
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 27-8-14.3.
Synopsis:  Coverage for doula services. Requires a health plan (an
accident and sickness insurance policy or a health maintenance
organization contract) to provide coverage for doula services if: (1) the
services provided are within the doula's area of professional
competence; and (2) the health plan would provide coverage for those
services if the services were provided by any other health care provider.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Vinzant
January 16, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial
Institutions.
2024	IN 269—LS 6971/DI 55 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 269
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
insurance.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 27-8-14.3 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]:
4 Chapter 14.3. Coverage for Doula Services
5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "doula" means an individual
6 who:
7 (1) is trained and certified by a nationally recognized
8 institution in providing emotional and physical support, but
9 not medical or midwife care, to pregnant individuals before,
10 during, and after childbirth; and
11 (2) may also provide assistance by referring childbearing
12 individuals to community-based organizations and certified
13 and licensed perinatal professionals in other disciplines.
14 Sec. 2. (a) As used in this chapter, "health plan" means either of
15 the following:
16 (1) A policy of accident and sickness insurance (as defined in
17 IC 27-8-5-1(a)), excluding the types of insurance and plans set
2024	IN 269—LS 6971/DI 55 2
1 forth in IC 27-8-5-2.5(a), that is issued, entered into, or
2 renewed after June 30, 2024.
3 (2) A contract with a health maintenance organization (as
4 defined in IC 27-13-1-19) that provides coverage for basic
5 health care services (as defined in IC 27-13-1-4) and that is
6 entered into or renewed after June 30, 2024.
7 (b) The term includes a person that administers:
8 (1) a policy described in subsection (a)(1); or
9 (2) a contract described in subsection (a)(2).
10 Sec. 3. (a) A health plan shall provide coverage for services
11 provided by a doula in accordance with the health plan's principles
12 and mechanisms of reimbursement, credentialing, and contracting
13 if:
14 (1) the services are within the doula's area of professional
15 competence; and
16 (2) the health plan would provide coverage for those services
17 if the services were provided by any other health care
18 provider.
19 (b) A health plan may not require supervision, a signature, or
20 referral by any other health care provider as a condition of
21 reimbursement for doula services, except when those requirements
22 are also applicable to other categories of health care providers.
23 (c) This section does not require a health plan to pay for
24 duplicate services actually rendered by both a doula and any other
25 health care provider.
26 (d) The department shall adopt rules under IC 4-22-2 to require
27 the reporting to the department of utilization and cost information
28 related to doula services covered under this section.
29 (e) Beginning July 1, 2025, every year on or before July 1, a
30 health plan required to cover doula services under this section shall
31 report to the department utilization and cost information related
32 to the doula services covered by the health plan.
2024	IN 269—LS 6971/DI 55