Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 37
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 236: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Representative Lehman added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Representative Porter added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Representative Clere added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Barrett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 142: yeas 47, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Yoder added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Glick added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senator Bassler added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Leising added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Authored by Senators Charbonneau and Becker
|
|
|