Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0273 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 28, 2024
Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Fiscal Note February 26, 2024
Fiscal Note February 22, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Fiscal Note February 6, 2024
Fiscal Note February 5, 2024
Fiscal Note February 1, 2024
Fiscal Note January 19, 2024
Bill January 11, 2024
Fiscal Note January 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024