House
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Teshka, Jordan, Cash
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Davis
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 145: yeas 46, nays 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Johnson T added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senators Dernulc, Raatz, Yoder added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Byrne added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Becker added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Glick added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Leising added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Becker removed as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Glick removed as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Tomes) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senators Qaddoura, Hunley, Donato, Rogers, Ford J.D. added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senator Crane added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senator Becker added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Buck added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senator Glick added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Authored by Senator Tomes
|
|
|