House | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Cosponsor: Representative Lehman | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Jeter | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Amendment #4 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Amendment #3 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Authored by Senators Messmer and Garten |