Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SJR0019 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 01/30/2024

                            *SJ9611*
Reprinted
January 31, 2024
SENATE JOINT
RESOLUTION  No. 19
_____
DIGEST OF SJ 19 (Updated January 30, 2024 2:44 pm - DI 92)
 
Citations Affected:  Article 4 of the Constitution of the State of
Indiana.
Synopsis:  Service on interbranch commissions. Adds a new section to
the Constitution of the State of Indiana specifying that a Senator or
Representative may serve on a commission, board, committee, or
similar entity organized to govern, advise, or provide oversight to an
agency of the administrative or executive departments of the state.
Provides that the following apply to a Senator or Representative
serving on an entity under the new constitutional provision: (1) The
Senator or Representative may be appointed to serve on the entity by
a member of the General Assembly or a committee of the General
Assembly. (2) The Senator or Representative may be a voting member,
an alternate member, or a nonvoting advisory member of the entity. (3)
The Senator or Representative may participate in any activity
conducted in the fulfillment of the entity's duties as prescribed by law,
rule, or executive order, other than the preparation or adoption of an
administrative rule. Limits the number of Senators and Representatives
that may be appointed to serve as voting members of an entity to: (1)
one Senator from each major political party; and (2) one Representative
from each major political party.
Effective:  This proposed amendment must be agreed to by two
consecutive general assemblies and ratified by a majority of the state's
voters voting on the question to be effective.
Messmer, Garten
January 10, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary.
January 18, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
January 30, 2024, read second time, amended, ordered engrossed.
SJ 19—SJ 9611/DI 92  Reprinted
January 31, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word
NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a
new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE JOINT
RESOLUTION No. 19
A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to Article 4 of
the Constitution of the State of Indiana concerning the general
assembly.
Be it resolved by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. The following amendment to the Constitution of the
2 State of Indiana is proposed and agreed to by this, the One Hundred
3 Twenty-Third General Assembly of the State of Indiana, and is referred
4 to the next General Assembly for reconsideration and agreement.
5 SECTION 2. ARTICLE 4 OF THE CONSTITUTION OF THE
6 STATE OF INDIANA IS AMENDED BY ADDING A NEW
7 SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS: Section 31. (a) Subject to
8 subsection (b), a Senator or Representative may serve on a
9 commission, board, committee, or similar entity organized to
10 govern, advise, or provide oversight to an agency of the
11 administrative or executive departments of the state. The following
12 apply to a Senator or Representative serving on an entity described
SJ 19—SJ 9611/DI 92 2
1 in this subsection:
2 (1) The Senator or Representative may be appointed to serve
3 on the entity by a member of the General Assembly or a
4 committee of the General Assembly.
5 (2) The Senator or Representative may be appointed to serve
6 as:
7 (A) a voting member;
8 (B) an alternate member; or
9 (C) a nonvoting advisory member;
10 of the entity. A Senator or Representative appointed to serve
11 as an alternate member or a nonvoting advisory member of
12 an entity may participate in the activities of the entity as
13 prescribed by law.
14 (3) The Senator or Representative may participate in any
15 activity conducted in the fulfillment of the entity's duties as
16 prescribed by law, rule, or executive order, other than the
17 preparation or adoption of an administrative rule.
18 (b) The appointment of a Senator or Representative to an entity
19 described in subsection (a) is limited as follows:
20 (1) Not more than one (1) Senator from each major political
21 party may be appointed to serve as a voting member of the
22 entity.
23 (2) Not more than one (1) Representative from each major
24 political party may be appointed to serve as a voting member
25 of the entity.
SJ 19—SJ 9611/DI 92 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Judiciary, to which
was referred Senate Joint Resolution No. 19, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
the recommendation that said resolution DO PASS.
 (Reference is to SJ 19 as introduced.)
           
BROWN L, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 3
_____
SENATE MOTION
Madam President: I move that Senate Joint Resolution 19 be
amended to read as follows:
Page 2, line 8, delete "order." and insert "order, other than the
preparation or adoption of an administrative rule.".
Page 2, delete lines 9 through 12.
(Reference is to SJR 19 as printed January 19, 2024.)
MESSMER
_____
SENATE MOTION
Madam President: I move that Senate Joint Resolution 19 be
amended to read as follows:
Page 1, line 7, delete "A" and insert "(a) Subject to subsection (b),
a".
Page 1, line 12, delete "section:" and insert "subsection:".
Page 2, delete lines 4 through 5, begin a new line block indented
and insert:
"(2) The Senator or Representative may be appointed to serve
as:
(A) a voting member;
(B) an alternate member; or
(C) a nonvoting advisory member;
of the entity. A Senator or Representative appointed to serve
as an alternate member or a nonvoting advisory member of
SJ 19—SJ 9611/DI 92 4
an entity may participate in the activities of the entity as
prescribed by law.".
Page 2, after line 12, begin a new paragraph and insert:
"(b) The appointment of a Senator or Representative to an
entity described in subsection (a) is limited as follows:
(1) Not more than one (1) Senator from each major political
party may be appointed to serve as a voting member of the
entity.
(2) Not more than one (1) Representative from each major
political party may be appointed to serve as a voting member
of the entity.".
(Reference is to SJR 19 as printed January 19, 2024.)
 
POL JR.
SJ 19—SJ 9611/DI 92