Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SJR0019 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 01/18/2024

                    *SJ9611*
January 19, 2024
SENATE JOINT
RESOLUTION  No. 19
_____
DIGEST OF SJ 19 (Updated January 17, 2024 3:55 pm - DI 149)
 
Citations Affected:  Article 4 of the Constitution of the State of
Indiana.
Synopsis:  Service on interbranch commissions. Adds a new section to
the Constitution of the State of Indiana specifying that a Senator or
Representative may serve on a commission, board, committee, or
similar entity organized to govern, advise, or provide oversight to an
agency of the administrative or executive departments of the state.
Provides that the following apply to a Senator or Representative
serving on an entity under the new constitutional provision: (1) The
Senator or Representative may be appointed to serve on the entity by
a member of the General Assembly or a committee of the General
Assembly. (2) The Senator or Representative may be a voting member
of the entity. (3) The Senator or Representative may participate in any
activity conducted in the fulfillment of the entity's duties as prescribed
by law, rule, or executive order. (4) The Senator or Representative may
participate in the preparation and adoption of an administrative rule by
an agency of the administrative or executive departments of the state. 
Effective:  This proposed amendment must be agreed to by two
consecutive general assemblies and ratified by a majority of the state's
voters voting on the question to be effective.
Messmer, Garten
January 10, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary.
January 18, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
SJ 19—SJ 9611/DI 92  January 19, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word
NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a
new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE JOINT
RESOLUTION No. 19
A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to Article 4 of
the Constitution of the State of Indiana concerning the general
assembly.
Be it resolved by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. The following amendment to the Constitution of the
2 State of Indiana is proposed and agreed to by this, the One Hundred
3 Twenty-Third General Assembly of the State of Indiana, and is referred
4 to the next General Assembly for reconsideration and agreement.
5 SECTION 2. ARTICLE 4 OF THE CONSTITUTION OF THE
6 STATE OF INDIANA IS AMENDED BY ADDING A NEW
7 SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS: Section 31. A Senator or
8 Representative may serve on a commission, board, committee, or
9 similar entity organized to govern, advise, or provide oversight to
10 an agency of the administrative or executive departments of the
11 state. The following apply to a Senator or Representative serving
12 on an entity described in this section:
SJ 19—SJ 9611/DI 92 2
1 (1) The Senator or Representative may be appointed to serve
2 on the entity by a member of the General Assembly or a
3 committee of the General Assembly.
4 (2) The Senator or Representative may be a voting member of
5 the entity.
6 (3) The Senator or Representative may participate in any
7 activity conducted in the fulfillment of the entity's duties as
8 prescribed by law, rule, or executive order.
9 (4) The Senator or Representative may participate in the
10 preparation and adoption of an administrative rule by an
11 agency of the administrative or executive departments of the
12 state.
SJ 19—SJ 9611/DI 92 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Judiciary, to which
was referred Senate Joint Resolution No. 19, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
the recommendation that said resolution DO PASS.
 (Reference is to SJ 19 as introduced.)
           
BROWN L, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 3
SJ 19—SJ 9611/DI 92