Indiana 2025 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1611 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/15/2025

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1611
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 1-1-8.1-0.5.
Synopsis:  Exemption from daylight saving time. Exempts Indiana
from daylight saving time.
Effective:  July 1, 2025.
Lindauer, Prescott
January 21, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Policy.
2025	IN 1611—LS 6287/DI 150 Introduced
First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1611
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
general provisions.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 1-1-8.1-0.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2025]: Sec. 0.5. (a) The state, acting under the exemption
4 provision of the Uniform Time Act of 1966 (15 U.S.C. 260a(a)), is
5 exempt from the federal provisions that establish daylight saving
6 time.
7 (b) The standard times within the state shall be the times known
8 and designated by the Uniform Time Act of 1966 as:
9 (1) eastern standard time; and
10 (2) central standard time;
11 depending on where a community is located.
12 (c) A state department or agency, or any county, city, or other
13 political subdivision may not employ any other time or adopt any:
14 (1) statute;
15 (2) ordinance; or
16 (3) order;
17 providing for daylight saving time.
2025	IN 1611—LS 6287/DI 150 2
1 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025] (a) To implement
2 IC 1-1-8.1-0.5, as added by this act, the governor shall, not later
3 than ten (10) days after the governor files this act with the
4 secretary of state, send a copy of this act along with any other
5 necessary documentation prescribed by the United States
6 Department of Transportation to the appropriate official of the
7 United States Department of Transportation.
8 (b) This SECTION expires January 1, 2026.
2025	IN 1611—LS 6287/DI 150